EP0171554 - Pile-driver device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt, Paul Winterberger Strasse D-5940 Lennestadt 1/Saalhausen / DE | [1986/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | König, Reimar, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | König, Reimar, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 Postfach 260254 D-40095 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107769.3 | 22.06.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843426374 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3426374 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171554 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171554 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171554 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E02D7/02, E02D13/10, F16L1/02 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
E02D7/02 (EP,US);
E02D13/10 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Rammvorrichtung | [1986/08] | English: | Pile-driver device | [1986/08] | French: | Dispositif de battage | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 21.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 30.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DE3112395 [ ] (SCHMIDT PAUL) | Examination | DE3129722 |