EP0170044 - Quantum-coupled device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bate, Robert T. 3106 Kristin Ct. Garland, TX 75042 / US | 02 /
Reed, Mark A. 5902 Preston Oaks Rd. Apt. 1038 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | [1986/06] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107785.9 | 24.06.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | US19840626802 | 02.07.1984 Original published format: US 626802 | [1986/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170044 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170044 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170044 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/66 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
H01L21/02395 (EP);
H01L21/02463 (EP);
H01L21/02546 (EP);
H01L21/0262 (EP);
H01L29/151 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/06] | Title | German: | Quantengekoppelte Bauelemente | [1986/06] | English: | Quantum-coupled device | [1986/06] | French: | Dispositifs à couplage quantique | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.11.1989 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2504732 | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 24, no. 12, 15th June 1974, pages 593-595, New York, US; L.L. CHANG et al.: "Resonant tunneling in semiconductor double barriers" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 43, no. 6, 15th September 1983, pages 588-590, New York, US; T.C.L.G. SOLLNER et al.: "Resonant tunneling through quantum wells at frequencies up to 2.5 THz" |