EP0205635 - Bidirectional power fet with bipolar on-state [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/52] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benjamin, James Anthony 20865 Hawthorne Ridge Court Waukesha Wisconsin 53186 / US | 02 /
Lade, Robert Walter 1009 North Jackson Street Apt. 2302 Milwaukee Wisconsin 53202 / US | 03 /
Schutten, Herman Peter 8545 North Fielding Road Bayside Wisconsin 53217 / US | [1986/52] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/52] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107803.0 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0205635 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H03K17/687 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
H01L29/7816 (EP,US);
H01L29/7393 (EP);
H01L29/7397 (EP);
H01L29/7809 (EP);
H01L29/7831 (EP);
H03K17/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/52] | Title | German: | Bidirektionaler Leistungsfeldeffekttransistor mit bipolarem Einschaltzustand | [1986/52] | English: | Bidirectional power fet with bipolar on-state | [1986/52] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ de puissance bidirectionnel à état passant bipolaire | [1986/52] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4199774 (PLUMMER JAMES D [US]); | [A]EP0097442 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0099175 (EATON CORP [US]); | [A]US4477742 (JANUTKA WILLIAM J [US]) |