EP0167921 - Flat spray nozzle for cooling of continuously conveyed cast strands in a continuous casting plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/03] | Method of and installation for cooling of continuously conveyed cast strands in a continuous casting plant | ||
[1988/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grothe, Horst Friedenstrasse 44 D-4044 Kaarst 1 / DE | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107858.4 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843425092 | 07.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3425092 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167921 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167921 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167921 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/124, B22D11/16 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
B05B1/267 (EP,US);
B22D11/1246 (EP,US);
B05B1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU [1986/03] | Title | German: | Flachstrahldüse zum Kühlen von kontinuierlich geförderten Giessträngen in einer Stranggiessanlage | [1988/17] | English: | Flat spray nozzle for cooling of continuously conveyed cast strands in a continuous casting plant | [1988/17] | French: | Pulvérisateur à jet plat pour la refroidissement de billettes convoyées continûment dans une installation de coulée continue | [1988/17] |
Former [1986/03] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kühlen von kontinuierlich geförderten Giesssträngen in einer Stranggiessanlage | ||
Former [1986/03] | Method of and installation for cooling of continuously conveyed cast strands in a continuous casting plant | ||
Former [1986/03] | Procédé et dispositif de refroidissement de billettes convoyées continûment dans une installation de coulée continue | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 30.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2746795 (ORVILLE KOFOID); | [AD]DE2401649 (CONCAST INC); | [A]DE2500079 (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK); | [AD]DE2501293 (VOEST AG); | [A]DE2816441 (LECHLER GMBH & CO KG, et al); | [A]DE3004864 | Examination | - "Die Prinzipien der Sekundärkühlung für das Stranggie~en von Stahl", Klepzig Fachberichte, 77. Jahrgang, Heft 3/1969 |