EP0167947 - Device for making foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holz, Bernhard Winterstrasse 7 D-7913 Senden / DE | [1986/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/03] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108068.9 | 28.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843425078 | 07.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3425078 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167947 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167947 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167947 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
B01F23/235 (EP);
B01F25/45242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/03] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Erzeugen von Schaum | [1986/03] | English: | Device for making foam | [1986/03] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de mousse | [1986/03] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 19.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.03.1990 | LU | 30.06.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1990/50] | SE | 14.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3128048 (DENURE JESSE V); | [A]US3270966 (ACKLEY JOHN W); | [X]US3604630 (CONTI NICK); | [A]GB1306020 ; | [A]US3827888 (TINNEY J, et al); | [A]EP0011381 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]US4231520 (WALDRUM JOHN E); | [A]GB2060420 (HAMPTONNS AERCRETE LTD) |