EP0167952 - Dye solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolff, Joachim, Dr. Neuenhauserweg 6 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Wolf, Karlheinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 77 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Marschner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Jaspers-Strasse 17 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1986/03] | Application number, filing date | 85108117.4 | 29.06.1985 | [1986/03] | Priority number, date | DE19843425813 | 13.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3425813 | DE19853504964 | 13.02.1985 Original published format: DE 3504964 | [1986/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0167952 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0167952 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167952 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/44, C09B67/26, C09B67/34 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
C09B67/0073 (EP,US);
C09B67/0076 (EP,US);
Y10S8/917 (US);
Y10S8/918 (US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1986/03] | Title | German: | Farbstoff-Lösungen | [1986/03] | English: | Dye solutions | [1986/03] | French: | Solutions de colorant | [1986/03] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2529658 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2657995 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]GB2051139 (ICI LTD); | [AD]DE2948292 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3207534 (BAYER AG [DE]) |