EP0170892 - Silica-titania cogel from two-step hydrolysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDaniel, Max Paul 1601 S.E. Melmart Dr. Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/07] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108342.8 | 05.07.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | US19840629152 | 09.07.1984 Original published format: US 629152 | [1986/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170892 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170892 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170892 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00, C08F10/00, C08F4/62 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/07] | Title | German: | Silika-Titania-Cogel durch zweistufige Hydrolyse | [1991/17] | English: | Silica-titania cogel from two-step hydrolysis | [1986/07] | French: | Cogel silica-titania par hydrolyse en deux étapes | [1991/17] |
Former [1986/07] | Silika-Titania-Cogel durch Zweistop-Hydrolyse | ||
Former [1986/07] | Cogel silica-titania pour hydrolyse en deux étapes | Examination procedure | 10.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3887494 (DIETZ RICHARD E); | [A]US4182815 (MCDANIEL MAX P [US], et al); | [A]US4339559 (MCDANIEL MAX P) |