EP0171617 - Method and device to operate an indirect converter with limitation of the surge current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaschke, Felix, Dr. Steinforststrasse 19 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1986/08] | Application number, filing date | 85108740.3 | 12.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | DE19843427841 | 27.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3427841 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171617 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171617 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/628, H02P7/62 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
H02P21/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betrieb eines Zwischenkreisumrichters mit Stromanstiegsbegrenzung | [1986/08] | English: | Method and device to operate an indirect converter with limitation of the surge current | [1986/08] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour l'exploitation d'un convertisseur indirect avec limitation de la montée de courant | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 17.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2144422 ; | [A]US3824437 (BLASCHKE F); | [A]DE3015144 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]EP0084367 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATION, Band IA-16, Nr. 2, März/April 1980, Seiten 193-202, IEEE, New York, US; L.H. WALKER et al.: "A high-performance controlled-current inverter drive" |