EP0169483 - Heterocyclic azo dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmann, Udo, Dr. Merckstrasse 26 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Erwin, Dr. Am Buechsenackerhang 31 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Hansen, Guenter, Dr. Alwin-Mittasch-Platz 8 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1986/05] | Application number, filing date | 85108902.9 | 16.07.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | DE19843427201 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3427201 | [1986/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0169483 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0169483 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169483 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/033, D06P1/18, C09B29/36 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
C09B29/0059 (EP,US);
C09B29/3691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/05] | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Azofarbstoffe | [1986/05] | English: | Heterocyclic azo dyes | [1986/05] | French: | Colorants azoiques hétérocycliques | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2388860 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [Y]FR2401960 (BASF AG [DE]) |