EP0169488 - Transformer circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voigt & Haeffner GmbH Hanauer Landstrasse 136 D-6000 Frankfurt 1 / DE | [1989/14] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states MITEC Moderne Industrietechnik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 15 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehnert, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Grillparzerstrasse 6 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
Bölkow, Ludwig, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Oberfeldallee 9 D-8022 Grünwald / DE | [1986/05] | Representative(s) | Strasser, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 14 85521 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Strasser, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [1986/05] | Strasser, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Englaender Innere Wiener Strasse 8 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108921.9 | 16.07.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | DE19843427291 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3427291 | DE19853502889 | 29.01.1985 Original published format: DE 3502889 | DE19853511182 | 27.03.1985 Original published format: DE 3511182 | [1986/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0169488 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0169488 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169488 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/30 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
G05F1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/05] | Title | German: | Transformatorschaltung | [1986/05] | English: | Transformer circuit | [1986/05] | French: | Circuit transformateur | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 14.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Request for further processing for: | 24.07.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2233020 (COOPER EDWARD); | [A]US3621375 (KETTLER CLARENCE J); | [AD]DE2500065 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |