EP0169490 - Device for processing folded products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hechler, Hatto, Dr. Zieglerstrasse 7 D-8900 Augsburg 22 / DE | [1986/05] | Application number, filing date | 85108923.5 | 17.07.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | DE19843427558 | 26.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3427558 | [1986/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169490 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169490 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/30, B65H29/58, B65H29/68, B65H39/045 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
B65H29/00 (EP,US);
B65H2301/44795 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2301/44795, B65H2220/01 (US,EP);
B65H2301/44795, B65H2220/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Weiterverarbeiten von Falzprodukten | [1986/05] | English: | Device for processing folded products | [1986/05] | French: | Dispositif pour transformer des produits pliés | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 23.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH622210 [ ] (GRUNER & JAHR [DE]); | DE2910964 [ ] |