EP0171638 - Melting of glass with staged submerged combustion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanneken, Henry Peter 49 Rose Leaf Drive Pittsburgh, Pa. 15220 / US | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108973.0 | 18.07.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | US19840632507 | 19.07.1984 Original published format: US 632507 | [1986/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171638 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171638 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/235 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
C03B5/2356 (EP,US);
C03B3/02 (EP,US);
F23C3/004 (EP,US);
F23D14/22 (EP,US);
F23D14/32 (EP,US);
F23D14/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | Schmelzen von Glas mit stufenweiser Innenfeuerung durch einen Tauchbrenner | [1986/08] | English: | Melting of glass with staged submerged combustion | [1986/08] | French: | Fusion de verre avec chauffage par étapes par brûleur immergé | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 11.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Request for further processing for: | 21.06.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3170781 (KEEFER GEORGE E); | [AD]US3224855 (EMILE PLUMAT); | [AD]US3237929 (EMILE PLUMAT, et al); | [AD]US3260587 (DOLF HANS R, et al); | [AD]US3606825 (JOHNSON ANDREW L); | [AD]US3627504 (JOHNSON ANDREW L, et al); | [AD]US3738792 (FENG C) |