EP0170972 - Piecing method and device for a friction open-end spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schubert & Salzer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states Schubert & Salzer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 D-85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Artzt, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Hugo-Wolf-Strasse 16 D-7410 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Egbers, Gerhard, Prof. Dipl.-Ing. Hugo-Wolf-Strasse 22 D-7410 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
Rottmayr, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Heinstrasse 10 D-7410 Reutlingen / DE | [1986/07] | Application number, filing date | 85109206.4 | 23.07.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | DE19843428890 | 04.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3428890 | [1986/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170972 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170972 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170972 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/52 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
D01H4/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/07] | D01H15/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wiederanspinnen einer Offenend-Friktionsspinnvorrichtung | [1986/07] | English: | Piecing method and device for a friction open-end spinning machine | [1986/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de rattache pour machine de filature à bouts libérés du type à friction | [1986/07] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 09.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE3416456 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]); | [XP]DE3347726 (STAHLECKER FRITZ [DE], et al); | [XP]DE3325928 (STAHLECKER FRITZ [DE], et al); | [XP]DE3321234 (STAHLECKER FRITZ, et al); | [XP]DE3318266 (STAHLECKER FRITZ [DE], et al); | [XP]DE3315034 (STAHLECKER FRITZ [DE], et al); | [E]GB2158468 (REINERS VERWALTUNGS GMBH); | [A]EP0034427 (HOLLINGSWORTH UK LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2059453 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN) |