EP0176688 - Valve spring retainer cap and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1989 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V 53127 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Deutsche Forschungs- und Versuchsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. D-5300 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinz, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Schliephakestrasse 4 D-6000 Frankfurt 80 / DE | 02 /
Steigleder, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Albert Schättlestrasse 127 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109291.6 | 24.07.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19843436193 | 03.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3436193 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176688 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176688 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176688 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F01L3/10 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
F01L3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Ventilfederteller und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1986/15] | English: | Valve spring retainer cap and method for its manufacture | [1986/15] | French: | Rondelle de retenu-ressort de soupape et sa méthode de fabrication | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59224410 ; | [A]DE3201023 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4432311 (HOLTZBERG MATTHEW W [US], et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 100 (M-376)[1823], 2. Mai 1985; & JP-A-59 224 410 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K.) 17-12-1984, & JP59224410 A 00000000 |