EP0211093 - Medicine for the treatment of herpes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keller, Helmut, Dr.med. Blumenstrasse 32 D-8646 Nordhalben / DE | [1987/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Pechmann, Eckehart, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Freiherr von Pechmann, Eckehart, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109616.4 | 31.07.1985 | [1987/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211093 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211093 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel zur Behandlung von Herpes | [1987/09] | English: | Medicine for the treatment of herpes | [1987/09] | French: | Médicament pour le traitement de l'herpès | [1987/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 08.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0019808 (KELLER HELMUT DR MED) | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 62, 1976, Nr. 22342, Biological Abstracts Inc., Philadelphia, PA, US; R.J. ROBINS et al.: "The nature of the stimuli causing digestive juice secretion in Dionaea muscipula Ellis (Venus's flytrap)", & PLANTA (BERL) 128(3): 263-265, 1976 |