EP0173100 - High power ignition transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSCHUK, Robert, Ing. Schlossweg 28 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states TSCHUK, Robert, Ing. Herrleinstrasse 11 D-63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | ||
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states Bertos AG Glarus / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/36] |
Former [1986/10] | 01 /
Tschuk, Robert Herrleinstrasse 11 D-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner Patentanwalt, Ebenauer Strasse 10 80637 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Ebenauer Strasse 10 80637 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/26] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/10] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109620.6 | 31.07.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | DE19843428763 | 03.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3428763 | [1986/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173100 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173100 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173100 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0173100 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/04, H01F38/14 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H01F27/245 (EP);
H01F38/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/10] | H01F27/04, H01F31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Hochleistungszündspule | [1986/10] | English: | High power ignition transformer | [1986/10] | French: | Bobine d'allumage de forte puissance | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 10.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.02.1992
17.03.1992
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1992/17] | 30.04.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.12.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.10.1994 | Appeal received No. T0829/94 | 06.02.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.12.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP524939 [ ]; | [A]JP52004939 ; | [A]GB618114 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [A]FR66586E (APP MARCHAL SOC D EXPL CONST D); | [X]CH342282 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE1273084 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GES MIT BESCHRA); | [A]DE2057786 (PHILBERTH BERNHARD, et al) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 1, Nr. 51, 18. Mai 1977, Seite 318 M 77; & JP-A-52 4939, & JP524939 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 1, Nr. 51, 18. Mai 1977, Seite 318 M 77; & JP-A-52 004 939 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 14-01-1977, & JP52004939 A 00000000 |