EP0173115 - Solenoid valve for vacuum application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states Leybold-Heraeus GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 Postfach 51 07 60 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Contzen, Franz-Peter Erlenweg 69 D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | 02 /
Jokisch, Gerhard Markusstrasse 121 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | 03 /
Vittori, Francesco Kierberger Strabe 45 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 D-50859 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109763.4 | 02.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | DE19843431037 | 23.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3431037 | [1986/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173115 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173115 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173115 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F16K1/48 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP,US);
F16K51/02 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32681 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32729 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/10] | F16K31/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1986/10] | Title | German: | Magnetventil für die Vakuumanwendung | [1986/10] | English: | Solenoid valve for vacuum application | [1986/10] | French: | Electrovanne pour application à vide | [1986/10] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/41] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH114339 (CLARION JULES [FR]); | [A]US2829861 (WRIGHT JAMES A); | [A]US3134932 (RAY WILLIAM A); | [A]US3552714 (MANVILLE CHARLES J); | [A]EP0089563 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |