EP0171052 - Conitration of mixed aromatic hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carr, Richard Van Court 416 S. 26th Street Allentown, PA. 18104 / US | 02 /
Toseland, Bernard Allen 720 N. 26th Street Allentown, PA. 18104 / US | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109833.5 | 05.08.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | US19840638437 | 07.08.1984 Original published format: US 638437 | [1986/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0171052 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0171052 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171052 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C201/08, C07C205/06 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
C07C201/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/08, C07C205/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/07] | C07C76/02, C07C79/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, SE [1986/07] | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Nitrierung von aromatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1986/07] | English: | Conitration of mixed aromatic hydrocarbons | [1986/07] | French: | Nitration commune d'hydrocarbures aromatiques | [1986/07] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]ES378838 ; | [AD]US4224249 (KUNZ NANCE D, et al); | [A]EP0108604 (UNIROYAL INC [US]); | [A]US3178481 (HAUZE RALPH C); | [A]US4028425 (GILBERT EVERETT E); | [YD]US3780116 (SAHGAL P) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 11, 17th September 1973, page 417, column 1, abstract no. 65991z, Columbus, Ohio, US; EMPRESA NACIONAL "CALVO SOTELO"; "Aromatic nitro derivatives from hydrocarbon mixtures", & SUBJECT INDEX, vol. 79, page 388CS, column 3, line 3; page 396CS, column 1, line 49; & ES - A - 378 838, & ES378838 A 00000000 |