EP0176704 - Multilayered adhesive label shrinkable onto the circumferential surface of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zweckform Etikettiertechnik Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Industriestrasse D-83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [1987/46] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Zweckform Werk GmbH Postfach 1280 Miesbacher Strasse 5 D-8150 Holzkirchen-Oberlaindern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Will, Rolf Osterleite 4 D-8170 Bad Tölz / DE | 02 /
Ast, Hans-Peter Haidstrasse 38 b D-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/15] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte H.Weickmann Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann B.Huber Dr. H.Liska Dr. J.Prechtel Dr. B.Böhm, Möhlstrasse 22, Postfach 860 820 W-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109895.4 | 06.08.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19843430162 | 16.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430162 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176704 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176704 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/06 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
B31D1/021 (EP,US);
G09F3/02 (EP,US);
G09F3/06 (EP,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,US);
H01M50/121 (EP,US);
H01M50/129 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0202 (EP,US);
G09F2003/021 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0225 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0233 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0251 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0255 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0267 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0272 (EP,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24868 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Von einer Umfangfläche eines Körpers aufschrumpfbares, mehrschichtiges Haftetikett | [1986/15] | English: | Multilayered adhesive label shrinkable onto the circumferential surface of an object | [1986/15] | French: | Etiquette adhésive à plusieurs couches, rétractable sur la surface circonférentielle d'un corps | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 29.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3542229 (BEYERLEIN LUDWIG, et al); | [A]GB1387619 (WARNECKE TUWA PLASTIK); | [A]US3927484 (SPIEGEL WILLIAM, et al); | [A]US4190168 (JACQUES PIERRE [US]); | [A]US4287274 (IBBOTSON PETER, et al) | [A] - PROSPEKT DER FA. ZWECKFORM WERK GMBH, ANWENDUNGS-INFO, veröffentlicht im März 1983 |