EP0172501 - Flexible, self-crosslinking binders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colon, Ismael 57 Curtis Avenue Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85109987.9 | 08.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | US19840639008 | 09.08.1984 Original published format: US 639008 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172501 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172501 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/81, C08G18/48, C08G18/62, C08G18/64, G11B5/702, C09D3/72, C08G18/67 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G11B5/7021 (EP,US);
C08G18/4879 (EP,US);
C08G18/6212 (EP,US);
C08G18/6407 (EP,US);
C08G18/6725 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/8175, C08G18/48 (EP,US);
C08G18/8175, C08G18/62 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Flexible selbstvernetzende Bindemittel | [1986/09] | English: | Flexible, self-crosslinking binders | [1986/09] | French: | Liants flexibles autoréticulables | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/40] | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/42] | 03.06.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4188472 (CHANG WEN-HSUAN [US]); | [X]US4210713 (IIMURE TAMIO [JP], et al); | [AP]EP0133908 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |