EP0173155 - Power supply for the light sources of frequency-modulated optical detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-73446 Oberkochen / DE | For:GB
CARL ZEISS-STIFTUNG HANDELND ALS CARL ZEISS D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | [1991/11] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as CARL ZEISS D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reule, Alfred, Dr. Kantstrasse 22 D-7080 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Schröder, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Albrecht-Erhard-Strasse 17 D-7080 Aalen / DE | [1986/10] | Application number, filing date | 85110083.4 | 12.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | DE19843431996 | 31.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3431996 | [1986/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173155 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173155 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173155 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, G05F1/63 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
G05F1/63 (EP,US);
H05B45/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Stromversorgung für Strahlungsquellen von frequenz-analogen optischen Sensoren | [1986/10] | English: | Power supply for the light sources of frequency-modulated optical detectors | [1986/10] | French: | Source d'alimentation pour source lumineuse de capteurs optiques à modulation de fréquence | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.02.1992 | GB | 05.02.1992 | SE | 05.02.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1993/14] | GB | 05.02.1992 | |
SE | 05.02.1992 | ||
FR | 26.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | SE | 05.02.1992 | |
FR | 26.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/38] | SE | 05.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59117616 ; | [Y]US4149071 (NAGAI YASUO, et al); | [A]EP0086528 (TNO [NL]); | [A]US3670202 (HEIDT MICHAEL F, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 245 (P-312)[1682], 10. November 1984; & JP-A-59 117 616 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 07-07-1984, & JP59117616 A 00000000 | [Y] - APPLIED OPTICS, Band 18, Nr. 24, 15. Dezember 1979, Seiten 4095-5000, Optical Society of America, US; F.S. CHEN: "Transverse coupling and front-mirror monitoring for feedback control of laser transmitters" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 16, Nr. 8, Januar 1974, Seiten 2598-2600, New York, US; D.C. THOMAS, Jr. et al.: "Digital feedback light-emitting diode control" |