EP0172524 - Method and apparatus for operating a boom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/09] | Method of operating a boom | ||
[1989/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.C. BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LIMITED Rocester Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states J.C. BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LIMITED Rocester Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knight, David John Willow Cottage Basford Bridge Lane Cheddleton Staffordshire ST13 7EP / GB | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Leach, John N., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Leach, John Nigel, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110148.5 | 13.08.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | GB19840021060 | 18.08.1984 Original published format: GB 8421060 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172524 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172524 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172524 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/22, B66F9/065 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
B66F9/22 (EP,US);
B66F9/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betätigen eines Auslegers | [1989/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for operating a boom | [1989/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour actionner une flèche | [1989/16] |
Former [1986/09] | Verfahren zum Betätigen eines Auslegers | ||
Former [1986/09] | Method of operating a boom | ||
Former [1986/09] | Procédé pour actionner une flèche | Examination procedure | 04.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 08.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2606078 (BROCK HAROLD A); | [A]FR1176523 (CLARK EQUIPMENT CO); | [Y]US3288316 (WEST WILLIAM S); | [Y]GB1102963 (RICHARD PAINE); | [Y]US3836025 (OLSON E, et al); | [A]US4266909 (LANGENFELD JOSEPH W, et al); | [A]DE3116303 (JOH TIRRE OHG MASCHF [DE]) |