EP0175904 - Device for measuring the filling level of liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dünstl, Josef Von-Ketteler-Strasse 4 D-8620 Lichtenfels / DE | [1986/14] | Application number, filing date | 85110157.6 | 13.08.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | DE19843431774 | 29.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3431774 | [1986/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0175904 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/28, G01F23/30, G10K11/22 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
G01F23/64 (EP);
G01F23/2962 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1986/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung des Füllstandes von Flüssigkeiten | [1986/14] | English: | Device for measuring the filling level of liquids | [1986/14] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer le niveau de remplissage des liquides | [1986/14] | File destroyed: | 22.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 23.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3693445 [ ]; | DE1248319 [ ]; | DE3330059 [ ]; | US3946831 [ ]; | FR1028724 [ ]; | DE1548930 [ ] |