EP0208808 - Printed resistor, method for making same and application thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1987 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanxiong, Zhu Dasarata No. 4 Bandung / ID | [1987/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110374.7 | 19.08.1985 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | CN1985202831 | 11.07.1985 Original published format: CN 85202831 | CN1985105318 | 11.07.1985 Original published format: CN 85105318 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208808 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/06, H01C7/00, H05B3/12, H05B41/00 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
H05B41/00 (EP);
H01C17/065 (EP);
H01C7/003 (EP);
H05B3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Gedruckter Widerstand, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Anwendung | [1987/04] | English: | Printed resistor, method for making same and application thereof | [1987/04] | French: | Résistance imprimée, sa méthode de fabrication et son application | [1987/04] | File destroyed: | 22.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB690478 ; | [A]DE2401784 ; | [A]FR1579597 ; | [A]DE1765774 | [X] - JEE, JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 19, no. 188, August 1982, pages 88-91, Tokyo, JP; K. SOGABE: "Thick-film resistor networks: their materials, trimming and production process"okage 88 - page 89, left-hand columnparagraph 1; figure 1 | [X] - MICROELECTRONICS JOURNAL, vol. 12, no. 2, March/April 1981, pages 32-34, Kirkcaldy, ScotlandGB; A.K. MATKARI et al.: "A novel approach for higher yield in thick-film resistors" |