EP0181444 - Suspension device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hespe & Woelm GmbH & Co. KG Hasselbecker Strasse 4 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gessner, Ulrich Hubertusstrasse 17 D-5628 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110436.4 | 20.08.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | DE19840033632U | 16.11.1984 Original published format: DE 8433632 U | [1986/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181444 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181444 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
E05D15/063 (EP);
E05Y2201/64 (EP);
E05Y2600/32 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | Hängevorrichtung | [1986/21] | English: | Suspension device | [1986/21] | French: | Dispositif de suspension | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 03.10.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1405931 ; | [A]CH430486 |