EP0173237 - Construction for mounting slider of door glass in motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Yuji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85110465.3 | 20.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | JP19840126868U | 21.08.1984 Original published format: JP 12686884 U | [1986/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173237 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173237 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173237 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/17 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
B60J10/79 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/10] | Title | German: | Gestaltung des Einbaues von Gleitstücken an Türscheiben in Kraftfahrzeugen | [1986/10] | English: | Construction for mounting slider of door glass in motor vehicle | [1986/10] | French: | Construction de montage d'une coulisse de vitre de porte dans une voiture automobile | [1986/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 15.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0040588 ; | [A]DE2847404 ; | [AD]US2024773 |