EP0179998 - Circuit arrangement for adjusting an echo canceller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haass, Adolf Eichelhäherstrasse 54 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [1986/19] | Application number, filing date | 85110760.7 | 27.08.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | DE19843435775 | 28.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3435775 | [1986/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179998 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179998 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/23 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
H04B3/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Abgleichen eines Echokompensators | [1986/19] | English: | Circuit arrangement for adjusting an echo canceller | [1986/19] | French: | Circuit pour ajuster un compensateur d'écho | [1986/19] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 14.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4012603 [ ] (ARASEKI TAKASHI, et al); | DE3208214 [ ] (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) | [ ] - FREQUENZ, Band 37, Juni 1983, Verlag Schiele & Schon, Berlin REINHARD TILL "Adaptive Sprecherecho-Kompensation in Modems fur die Duplex-Datenubertragung im Fernsprechnetz" Seiten 145-154 * Bild 9 * |