EP0176796 - Roller for track laying vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1988 [1988/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Aktiengesellschaft Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 D-80997 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seit, Horst Steinbach 28 D-8086 Moorenweis / DE | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85111208.6 | 05.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19843435872 | 29.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3435872 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176796 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176796 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/14 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
B62D55/14 (EP);
B62D55/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Laufrolle für ein Gleiskettenfahrzeug | [1986/15] | English: | Roller for track laying vehicle | [1986/15] | French: | Galet pour véhicule à chenilles | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 24.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2515443 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG); | [A]EP0035913 |