EP0176804 - Silver halide color photograhic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furutachi, Nobuo c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi / JP | 02 /
Kawagishi, Toshio c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi / JP | 03 /
Nakazyo, Kiyoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi / JP | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/15] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111297.9 | 06.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | JP19840187204 | 06.09.1984 Original published format: JP 18720484 | JP19840268924 | 20.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26892484 | [1986/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176804 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176804 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, C07D487/04, // (C07D487/04, 249:00, 231:00) | [1986/15] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C7/30529 (EP,US);
G03C7/3825 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/15] | Title | German: | Farbphotographische Silberhalogenidmaterialien | [1986/15] | English: | Silver halide color photograhic materials | [1986/15] | French: | Matériaux photographiques couleurs à l'halogénure d'argent | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3209710 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]); | [X]GB2135788 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [AD]EP0119741 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |