EP0175274 - Method of separation of blood components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/13] | Apparatus for separation of blood components | ||
[1990/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading as TERUMO CORPORATION 44-1, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151 / JP | For all designated states Japanese Red Cross Society 1-3, 1-chome Shibadaimon Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/13] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading as TERUMO CORPORATION 44-1, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151 / JP | ||
For all designated states Japanese Red Cross Society 1-3, 1-chome Shibadaimon Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomono, Tsugikazu 379-30, Toyoshiki Kashiwa-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Igarashi, Shigeru 22-10, 5-chome Yahiro Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sawada, Eiko 9-5, 4-chome Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tokunaga, Eiichi 1-6, 1-chome Saginomiya Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Minagawa, Yoshinori 1897-95, Aoki Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 06 /
Kawaoka, Tatsuhiko 237-97, Hoshiyama Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1986/13] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/13] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel und Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111490.0 | 11.09.1985 | [1986/13] | Priority number, date | JP19840190476 | 13.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19047684 | [1986/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0175274 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0175274 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0175274 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [1986/13] | CPC: |
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
A61M2039/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/13] | Title | German: | Methode zur Trennung von Blutbestandteilen | [1990/47] | English: | Method of separation of blood components | [1990/47] | French: | Méthode de séparation des constituants du sang | [1990/47] |
Former [1986/13] | Apparat zur Trennung von Blutbestandteilen | ||
Former [1986/13] | Apparatus for separation of blood components | ||
Former [1986/13] | Appareil pour la séparation des constituants du sang | Examination procedure | 08.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3870042 (VIGUIER LEON FERNAND); | [A]FR2283700 (BAXTER LABORATORIES INC [US]); | [A]EP0073847 (BIOTEST SERUM INSTITUT GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO8400492 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]) |