EP0177791 - Radiation curable primer coating compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 15, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 162 oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 15, Kitahama 5-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 2-1-2, Oyodokita Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Koichi 13 Yawata Baba Yawata-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Sumiyoshi, Iwao 2-6-16, Aikawa Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | 03 /
Ishihara. Ryoji 2-15-505, Nakamiyakitamachi Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Ohkita, Masakazu No. 502, 1-8-31 Minamitanabe Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka / JP | 05 /
Arai, Tetsuzo 16-11 Sakasedai 4-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Yoshiiwa, Masanori 256-16 Nishinosho Wakayama-shi Wakayama-ken / JP | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patent Attorneys, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Sternwartstrasse 4 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85111514.7 | 12.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | JP19840191936 | 13.09.1984 Original published format: JP 19193684 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177791 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177791 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177791 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/02, C09D163/10, C08F220/00, C08F299/02 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
C08F299/028 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09J4/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/10 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F220/26 (EP);
C09J4/00, C08F220/10 (EP);
C09J4/00, C08F220/26 (EP) |
Former IPC [1986/16] | C09D3/80, C08F220/00, C08F299/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/16] | Title | German: | Durch Strahlung vernetzbare Grundierüberzugzusammensetzungen | [1986/16] | English: | Radiation curable primer coating compositions | [1986/16] | French: | Compositions de revêtement primaires réticulables par irradiation | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4178425 |