EP0176883 - Rubbing surface packing of a double belt press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.02.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1994 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Held, Kurt Alte Strasse 1 D-78647 Trossingen / DE | [1986/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85111898.4 | 20.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19843436158 | 03.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3436158 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176883 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176883 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0176883 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/24, B30B5/06 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
B30B5/062 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1741 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Gleitflächendichtungen an Doppelbandpressen | [1986/15] | English: | Rubbing surface packing of a double belt press | [1986/15] | French: | Jointure de glissière double d'une presse à bandes doubles | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 05.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.1989
15.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Hymmen GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Postfach 10 15 13 D-33515 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.1989
15.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE Hymmen GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Postfach 10 15 13 D-33515 Bielefeld / DE Opponent's representative Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | 17.01.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.10.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 14.01.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 15.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.06.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.02.1994 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3310700 [ ] (HYMMEN KG THEODOR [DE]); | DE2937972 [ ] (HYMMEN KG THEODOR) |