EP0215971 - Antenna feed network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flam, Richard Paul 405 Henley Court Doylestown Pennsylvania 18901 / US | [1987/14] | Representative(s) | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/14] | Brullé, Jean, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 85112056.8 | 24.09.1985 | [1987/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215971 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/40 | [1987/14] | CPC: |
H01Q3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/14] | Title | German: | Antenne speisendes Netzwerk | [1987/14] | English: | Antenna feed network | [1987/14] | French: | Réseau d'alimentation d'antenne | [1987/14] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/21] | 04.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4143379 ; | [YD]US4321605 ; | [AD]US4041501 ; | [AD]US3803625 |