EP0177864 - Multijunction semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Jun 29-204, Karakuchidai 4 Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Minori 5-40, Higashihitomaru-cho Akashi-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Tawada, Yoshihisa 14-39, Miyamadai Oike Kita-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Gille, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Gille, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Türk, Gille + Hrabal Patentanwälte Bruckner Strasse 20 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112318.2 | 28.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | JP19840213944 | 11.10.1984 Original published format: JP 21394484 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177864 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177864 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177864 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/06, H01L31/06 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
H01L31/076 (EP,US);
H01L31/10 (KR);
H01L25/074 (EP,US);
H01L29/868 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32145 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Halbleiteranordnung mit mehreren Übergängen | [1986/16] | English: | Multijunction semiconductor device | [1986/16] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur à multi-jonction | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1987 | New documents discovered [1987/18] | 28.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 24.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4272641 (HANAK JOSEPH J); | [A]US4387265 (DALAL VIKRAM L); | [XP]US4536647 (ATALLA MARTIN M [US], et al) | [A] - RCA REVIEW, vol. 38, no. 3, September 1977, pages 390-405, Princeton, New Jersey, US; Y.S. CHIANG et al.: "Low-resistance all-epitaxial PIN diodes for ultra-high-frequency applications" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 21, suppl. 21-1, 1982, pages 297-303, Tokyo, JP; Y. TAWADA et al.: "Window effects of hydrogenated amorphous silicon carbide in a p-i-n a-Si solar cell" | Examination | US4536607 |