EP0176999 - Amino acid derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.1989 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 55216 Ingelheim / DE | For:GB
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Postfach 200 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:GB
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [1986/15] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:GB
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roos, Otto, Dr. Elsheimer Strasse 36 D-6501 Schwabenheim / DE | 02 /
Schnorrenberg, Gerd, Dr. Fichtenweg 13 D-6507 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE | 03 /
Lösel, Walter Im Herzenacker 26 D-6535 Gau-Alfesheim / DE | 04 /
Wiedemann, Ingrid, Dr. Ernst-Ludwig-Strasse 61 D-6535 Gau-Algesheim / DE | 05 /
Gaida, Wolfram, Dr. Paul-Clemen-Strasse 14 D-6507 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE | 06 /
Hoefke, Wolfgang, Dr. Rosselstrasse 27 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85112356.2 | 30.09.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | DE19843436569 | 05.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3436569 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176999 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176999 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, A61K37/02, A61K37/64 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
C07K5/06086 (EP);
C07K5/04 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Aminosäurederivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1986/15] | English: | Amino acid derivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions | [1986/15] | French: | Dérivés d'amino-acides, leur procédé de préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques | [1986/15] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 13.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/21] | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2045771 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | EP0079522 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | EP0110224 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]) |