EP0198951 - Orthopaedic support, especially an orthopaedic shoe insertion, and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1989 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Globus Fussstützenfabrik Karl Kremendahl Höhenweg 89 D-5630 Remscheid 1 / DE | [1986/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremendahl, Jürgen Reinwardtstrasse 11 D-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | [1986/44] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bardehle, Heinz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/44] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 D-42028 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112695.3 | 07.10.1985 | [1986/44] | Priority number, date | DE19850009263U | 28.03.1985 Original published format: DE 8509263 U | [1986/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198951 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198951 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198951 | Date: | 23.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/47] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0198951 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/14 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
A43B7/1415 (EP,US);
A43B17/14 (EP,US);
A43B7/142 (EP,US);
A43B7/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/44] | Title | German: | Orthopädisches Stützteil, insbesondere orthopädische Schuheinlage, sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1986/44] | English: | Orthopaedic support, especially an orthopaedic shoe insertion, and process for its production | [1986/44] | French: | Dispositif orthopédique de support, notamment insertion orthopédique pour chaussures et son procédé de fabrication | [1986/44] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.11.1988 | GB | 23.11.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/03] | GB | 23.11.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | US1974161 [ ] (RILEY WILLIAM J); | CH192694 [ ] (MAY JOSEPH [DE]); | CH193462 [ ] (ZIDEK KARL [AT]); | CH241203 [ ] (LIENHARD ADOLF [CH]); | CH256494 [ ] (PELANT VILIBALD [CZ]); | DE2016000 [ ] |