EP0177928 - Optical waveguide, particularly optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nordby, Rasmus 10177 Viceroy Ct. No.2 Cupertino California 95014 / US | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/16] | Schulte, Knud, Dipl.-Ing. Hewlett-Packard GmbH Europ. Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 D-71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112707.6 | 08.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | US19840659150 | 09.10.1984 Original published format: US 659150 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177928 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177928 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
G02B6/262 (EP);
G02B6/4214 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | Lichtwellenleiter, insbesondere optische Faser | [1986/16] | English: | Optical waveguide, particularly optical fiber | [1986/16] | French: | Guide d'onde, en particulier fibre optique | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 30.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4130343 ; | [A]US4381882 ; | [A]GB2135473 | Examination | EP0088410 |