EP0178577 - Felt body as a technical device, as well as method and apparatus for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brand, Jack 33 Harbour Square Toronto Ontario, M5J 2G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states Brand, Jack 33 Harbour Square Toronto Ontario, M5J 2G2 / CA | ||
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states Brand, Jack Emmerstedter Strasse D-3330 Helmstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112780.3 | 09.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | DE19843438381 | 19.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3438381 | [1986/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178577 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178577 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B24D13/12 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
B24D13/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T442/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/17] | Title | German: | Filzkörper als technisches Hilfsmittel sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [1986/17] | English: | Felt body as a technical device, as well as method and apparatus for making the same | [1986/17] | French: | Pièce de feutre en tant qu'outil technique ainsi que la méthode et le dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1986/17] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/47] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB557038 (UNITED COTTON PRODUCTS COMPANY); | [X]FR1307038 (CARBORUNDUM CO); | [X]FR564197 ; | [X]FR2222174 (TOYODA MACHINE WORKS LTD [JP]); | [X]GB417085 (WILLIAM HARLAND MCGILL); | [XP]CH650440 (STUDER AG FRITZ); | [A]CH398951 (ARMOUR & CO [US]) |