EP0177964 - Ceramic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1991 [1991/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Naomi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tamura, Hidemasa c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112869.4 | 10.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | JP19840213594 | 12.10.1984 Original published format: JP 21359484 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0177964 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0177964 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177964 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, G11B5/31, G11B5/147 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
G11B5/1475 (EP,US);
G11B5/31 (EP,US);
G11B5/3109 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1157 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24281 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | Keramikzusammensetzung | [1986/16] | English: | Ceramic composition | [1986/16] | French: | Composition céramique | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1646746 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |