EP0178624 - Liposomes from synthetic lipids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarcsay, Lajos, Dr. Muttenzerstrasse 25 D-7889 Grenzbach-Wyhlen / DE | 02 /
Eibl, Hansjörg, Prof. Dr. Steinweg 51 D-3406 Bovenden / DE | 03 /
Fankhauser, Peter, Dr. Hauptstrasse 65 CH-4107 Ettingen / CH | 04 /
Peil, Anita, Dr. Feldbergstrasse 50 CH-4057 Basel / CH | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113027.8 | 14.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | CH19840004951 | 16.10.1984 Original published format: CH 495184 | [1986/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178624 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178624 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178624 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61K9/50 (KR);
Y10S436/829 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Liposomen aus synthetischen Lipiden | [1986/17] | English: | Liposomes from synthetic lipids | [1986/17] | French: | Liposomes à partir de lipides synthétiques | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2647395 (NATTERMANN A & CIE); | [A]USRE30748E ; | [A]US4302459 (STECK EDGAR A, et al); | [Y]EP0088046 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0099068 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]); | [YP]EP0147741 (NATTERMANN A & CIE [DE]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 100, Nr. 25, 18. Juni 1984, Seite 220, Zusammenfassung Nr. 205314k, Columbus, Ohio, US; P. VAN HOOGEVEST et al.: "The influence of lipid composition on glycophorin-induced bilayer permeability", & BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA 1984, 771(2), 119-26 |