EP0178656 - Method and apparatus for separating from excavated materials the fine and coarse constituents thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRODEC INTER AB P.O. Box 164 241 00 Eslöv / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | For all designated states PRODEC INTER AB P.O. Box 164 S-241 00 Eslöv / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlsson, Leif Rolsberga S-241 00 Eslöv / SE | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl Heinz Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Wagner, Karl Heinz H. Wagner & Co. AB Norra Vallgatan 72 S-211 22 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 85113149.0 | 16.10.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | SE19840005199 | 18.10.1984 Original published format: SE 8405199 | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178656 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178656 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E02F7/06, E02F3/40 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
E02F7/06 (EP,US);
E02F3/401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Trennen von groben und feinen ausgegrabenen Materialien | [1986/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for separating from excavated materials the fine and coarse constituents thereof | [1986/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la séparation des produits gros et fins d'excavation | [1986/17] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3765490 (LOGUE G); | [A]US4005755 (BAKKE EVEN A, et al); | [X]GB1512206 (FOULGER LTD W); | [A]US4157956 (ROBINSON LEO E [US]); | [X]EP0047041 (DALFSEN RUDOLF HENDRIK VAN [NL], et al) |