EP0179437 - Measuring device for measuring the contact pressure of grippers in sheet-fed machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 D-97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaede, Johannes Georg Ludwigkai 28 D-8700 Würzburg / DE | [1986/18] | Application number, filing date | 85113367.8 | 22.10.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | DE19843438929 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3438929 | [1986/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0179437 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0179437 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179437 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41F21/04, B41F33/00 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
B41F21/04 (EP);
B41F33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | Messeinrichtung zum Messen eines Greiferauflagedruckes in Bogenrotationsdruckmaschinen | [1986/18] | English: | Measuring device for measuring the contact pressure of grippers in sheet-fed machines | [1986/18] | French: | Dispositif de mesure pour mesurer la pression d'appui des pinces dans les machines d'impression à feuilles | [1986/18] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 15.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58084770 ; | [Y]US2461691 (LYNN ROBERT G); | [A]FR992938 ; | [Y]FR1177159 (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [A]FR1428513 ; | [Y]DE2655421 (MESSERSCHMITT ELMAR DR) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 183 (M-235)[1328], 12. August 1983; & JP-A-58 084 770 (SUMITOMO JUKIKAI KOGYO K.K.) 20-05-1983, & JP58084770 A 00000000 |