EP0180943 - Channel switching system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1992 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morimoto, Hideaki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Hiromi c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85113982.4 | 04.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | JP19840232711 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23271184 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180943 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180943 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180943 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/22 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1986/20] | Title | German: | Kanalumschaltsystem | [1986/20] | English: | Channel switching system | [1986/20] | French: | Système de commutation de canaux | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5797749 ; | [A]US4477895 (CASPER PAUL W [US], et al); | [A]US4234956 (ADDERLEY JOHN A, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 185 (E-132)[1063], 21st September 1982; & JP-A-57 97 749 (FUJITSU K.K.) 17-06-1982, & JP5797749 A 00000000 | [A] - 13TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, Nürnberg, DE, 5th - 8th September 1983, pages 621-626, Microwave Exhibitions and Publishers Ltd, Turnbridge Wells, Kent, GB; A. BRENDT: "Protection switching for digital radio links" |