EP0180978 - Electronic cash register [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-Cho Abeno-Ku Osaka 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamura, Sigeyuki 220-3, Senzai-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yasuhide 527-12, Tsutsui-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/20] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114137.4 | 06.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | JP19840168831 | 07.11.1984 Original published format: JP 16883184 | JP19840170843 | 09.11.1984 Original published format: JP 17084384 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180978 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180978 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180978 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/12 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
G07G1/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1986/20] | Title | German: | Elektronische Registrierkasse | [1986/20] | English: | Electronic cash register | [1986/20] | French: | Caisse enregistreuse électronique | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 10.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54101636 ; | [X]US4361877 (DYER ROBERT E, et al); | [A]EP0058803 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]); | [XP]JPS60215274 (FUJITSU LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 124 (E-144), 17th October 1979; & JP-A-54 101 636 (TOKYO DENKI K.K.) 10-08-1979, & JP54101636 A 00000000 | Examination | US4213179 |