EP0181616 - Friction material using iron powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Mitsuhiko c/o Itami Works Sumitomo El. Ind. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Nitto, Fumiaki c/o Itami Works Sumitomo El. Ind. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo / JP | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114216.6 | 07.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | JP19840238196 | 12.11.1984 Original published format: JP 23819684 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181616 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181616 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181616 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
F16D69/027 (EP,US);
B29C43/006 (EP,US);
B29C43/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/21] | Title | German: | Reibwerkstoff mit Eisenpulver | [1986/21] | English: | Friction material using iron powder | [1986/21] | French: | Matériau de frottement utilisant de la poudre de fer | [1986/21] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB720291 (JOHNS MANVILLE); | [Y]BE554868 ; | [Y]US4352416 (LARSON HUGO R, et al); | [A]GB1343489 (SCHARF GMBH MASCHF); | [A]EP0050377 (RUETGERSWERKE AG [DE]) |