EP0182228 - Light reflector made by successive injections of two thermoplastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEIMAN 39 Avenue Marceau F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1987/38] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states Signal Vision S.A. 39 Avenue Marceau F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Creff, René 13, rue Benoit Voisin F-89100 Sens / FR | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114252.1 | 08.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | FR19840017250 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417250 | [1986/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182228 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182228 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/22 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
F21S41/37 (EP,US);
F21V7/24 (EP,US);
F21V7/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer, hergestellt durch aufeinander folgendes Spritzgiessen zweier Thermoplaste | [1986/22] | English: | Light reflector made by successive injections of two thermoplastic materials | [1986/22] | French: | Réflecteur réalisé par injections successives de deux matières thermoplastiques | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 12.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.01.1989 | SE | 25.01.1989 | [1990/01] |
Former [1989/36] | SE | 25.01.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2316304 (VALENTINE CIE VERNIS [FR]) | Examination | DE2244921 | DE2928582 |