EP0181633 - Method and device for reducing the oil consumption of an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WADEPHUL, Jost Westfleth 23 D-2150 Buxtehude / DE | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Liebelt, Rolf Meissner, Bolte & Partner Alstertor 20 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | Liebelt, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Baumbach & Liebelt Patentanwaltskanzlei Ballindamm 15 D-20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114412.1 | 13.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | DE19840033272U | 14.11.1984 Original published format: DE 8433272 U | DE19853534312 | 26.09.1985 Original published format: DE 3534312 | [1986/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181633 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181633 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/00 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
F01M13/00 (EP);
F01M2013/0427 (EP);
F01M2013/0494 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verringerung des Motorölverbrauches von oszillierenden Verbrennungskraftmaschinen | [1986/21] | English: | Method and device for reducing the oil consumption of an internal-combustion engine | [1986/21] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour diminuer la consommation d'huile d'un moteur à combustion interne alternatif | [1986/21] | File destroyed: | 11.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/23] | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.10.1987 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2688316 ; | [Y]DE2828256 ; | [A]US3326198 ; | [A]FR961034 ; | [A]US3175546 ; | [A]US2652819 ; | [A]FR2375448 ; | [A]DE2048340 ; | [A]GB1531080 |