EP0181642 - Catalyst composition for polymerization of cycloolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Andrea Elizabeth R.D. 1, Box 121B Avondale Pennsylvania 19311 / US | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/18] | Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1986/21] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114486.5 | 14.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | US19840672423 | 16.11.1984 Original published format: US 672423 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181642 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181642 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | Katalysatorzusammensetzung zur Cycloolefinpolymerisation | [1986/21] | English: | Catalyst composition for polymerization of cycloolefins | [1986/21] | French: | Composition de catalyseur pour la polymérisation de cyclooléfines | [1986/21] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/41] | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0094626 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [A]FR2070802 (BAYER AG) |