EP0183171 - Method of preparing enhanced efficacy aluminum chlorhydrate antiperspirant and antiperspirant composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHEIS, INC. 235 Snyder Avenue Berkeley Heights New Jersey 07922 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states REHEIS, INC. 235 Snyder Avenue Berkeley Heights New Jersey 07922 / US | ||
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states Armour Pharmaceutical Company 303 South Broadway Tarrytown New York 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murray, Robert W. Concord Road, RD 3 Lebanon, N.J. / US | 02 /
Nelson, Roger E. 1526 Leon Drive Hatfield Pennsylvania / US | 03 /
Rubino, Andrew M. 229 Livingston Avenue New Providence, N.J. / US | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114693.6 | 19.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | US19840673959 | 21.11.1984 Original published format: US 673959 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183171 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183171 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183171 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/56, A61K7/38 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP);
C01F7/57 (EP,US);
C01P2002/87 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/23] | C01F7/58, A61K7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Antitranspirans-Aluminiumoxychlorids höherer Wirksamkeit und Antitranspirans-Zusammensetzung | [1986/23] | English: | Method of preparing enhanced efficacy aluminum chlorhydrate antiperspirant and antiperspirant composition | [1986/23] | French: | Méthode pour préparer un antitranspirant de chlorhydrate d'aluminium plus efficace et composition antitranspirante | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/50] | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.1990 | BE | 07.03.1990 | CH | 07.03.1990 | LI | 07.03.1990 | LU | 30.11.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/17] | AT | 07.03.1990 | |
BE | 07.03.1990 | ||
CH | 07.03.1990 | ||
LI | 07.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 07.03.1990 | |
LI | 07.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3904741 (JONES JOHN L, et al); | [A]GB1568831 (UNILEVER LTD); | [A]GB2048229 (GILLETTE CO) |