|
25.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.10.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.09.1997 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.09.1997 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.03.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1995 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1994 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
27.08.1994 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
01.08.1994 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1994 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.03.1994 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1994 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1993 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.09.1993 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.09.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1993 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1993 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1993 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.1993 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1993 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1992 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1992 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1992 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.09.1991 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.1991 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.09.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1989 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.1989 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1989 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1989 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.1986 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1985 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1985 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.11.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |